Global Patent Index - EP 0976848 A1

EP 0976848 A1 2000-02-02 - METAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING METAL ACETILIDE, BLANK HAVING METALLIC COATING FORMED THEREWITH, AND METHOD FOR FORMING THE METALLIC COATING

Title (en)

METAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING METAL ACETILIDE, BLANK HAVING METALLIC COATING FORMED THEREWITH, AND METHOD FOR FORMING THE METALLIC COATING

Title (de)

METALLZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ACETYLID, DAMIT METALLISCH BESCHICHTETER ROHLING UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION METALLIQUE CONTENANT UN ACETYLURE DE METAL, EBAUCHE DOTEE D'UN REVETEMENT METALLIQUE FORME A L'AIDE DE LADITE COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION DUDIT REVETEMENT METALLIQUE

Publication

EP 0976848 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953055 A

Priority

  • JP 9805139 W
  • JP 36380397 A

Abstract (en)

A metallic composition such as a metal liquid, metal paste, etc. is manufactured by using a metal acetylide compound expressed by the general formula M(-C IDENTICAL C-R)n (in the formula, M indicates a metal atom, n indicates the valence number of the metal atom M, and R is a hydrocarbon group which may or may not contain oxygen atoms) as an organo-metal source, and by mixing and kneading an organic solvent and/or a resin together with such a metal acetylide compound. When this metallic composition is applied in a desired pattern to prescribed portions of electronic elements or ornamental items such as porcelain vessels or glass, etc., and at least these prescribed portions are dried and heated, the result is that the organic substances other than the metal are broken down and released, and the metal alone is sintered in the pattern. This pattern shows an ornamental metallic luster in the case of ornamental items, and forms electrodes in the case of electronic elements. Since the metal acetylide compounds do not contain sulfur or halogen elements, these compounds do not release environmental contaminants such as sulfurous acid gas, halogen gases, etc. even when fired; accordingly, such compounds can contribute to the cleaning of the environment. Furthermore, since these compounds have a high solubility in organic solvents, they are suitable as raw materials in metallic compositions. Moreover, the metallic film that is formed after firing is smooth and finely textured and has a high metallic luster and electrical conductivity; accordingly, this film can form high-quality ornamental films in ornamental items and electrodes in electronic component, etc.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 18/08; C07F 15/00; C07F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 1/09 (2006.01); C07F 1/10 (2006.01); C07F 1/12 (2006.01); C08K 5/56 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01); C09D 1/00 (2006.01); C23C 18/08 (2006.01); H01B 1/16 (2006.01); H05K 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 18/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976848 A1 20000202; EP 0976848 A4 20050223; EP 0976848 B1 20090211; DE 69840542 D1 20090326; JP 3491021 B2 20040126; JP H11158184 A 19990615; KR 20000069225 A 20001125; TW 561140 B 20031111; WO 9927159 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151113

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151113

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69840542

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-03-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-02-23 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20050111

2005-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 23C 18/08 A

2005-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07F 19/00 B

2005-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07F 15/00 B

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990809

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT