Global Patent Index - EP 0976858 A1

EP 0976858 A1 2000-02-02 - Ribbon-like elements for making holding structures for tubular workpieces of elastomer material

Title (en)

Ribbon-like elements for making holding structures for tubular workpieces of elastomer material

Title (de)

Flachbandelemente zur Herstellung einer Halterungsstruktur für rohrförmige elastomere Werkstücke

Title (fr)

Eléments de type ruban pour la fabrication de structures de retenue pour des pièces tubulaires en élastomère

Publication

EP 0976858 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830440 A

Priority

EP 98830440 A

Abstract (en)

Textile containment ribbon (1) able to be wound around crude rubber tubes to effect a structural containment thereof during the subsequent vulcanisation phase. The ribbon (1) presents a series of warp threads (2) enmeshed with a series of sections formed by one or more woof threads (3) to form a compact reticular structure. The warp threads (2) present the same count and the same density as the woof sections (3), thereby making the ribbon (1) easy to weld to another by means of ultrasonic welding. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 23/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] WO 9309281 A1 19930513 - T & N PLC [GB], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976858 A1 20000202; EP 0976858 B1 20011010; AT 206775 T 20011015; DE 69801993 D1 20011115; DE 69801993 T2 20020404

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090721

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080804

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-03-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-10-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69801993 20011115

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 206775 T 20011015

2001-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NASTRIFICIO ASSI S.R.L

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990503

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI