Global Patent Index - EP 0976859 A1

EP 0976859 A1 2000-02-02 - Process for repairing faulty weftpicks in weaving looms, more especially air jet looms

Title (en)

Process for repairing faulty weftpicks in weaving looms, more especially air jet looms

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Beheben eines Schussfehlers auf Webmaschinen, insbesondere Luftdüsenwebmaschinen mit pneumatischen Einlegern

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la réparation de fils de trame cassés dans les métiers à tisser, plus particulièrement les métiers à jet d'air

Publication

EP 0976859 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111474 A

Priority

DE 19833079 A

Abstract (en)

When a faulty pick is detected, the cutting action of the yarn cutters (6,7) is suppressed but the beating-up action continues due to the inertia of the loom. To facilitate withdrawal of the yarn loop (4a) by a suction nozzle (11), an air jet is directed by an assisting nozzle (13) against the action of the reed (3) to release the yarn from the edge-forming mechanism (10). An Independent claim is also included for an air jet loom incorporating an assisting nozzle (13) to direct an air jet against the edge-forming mechanism (10). An angled impact surface (14) directs the jet against the entrainment slot (10b).

Abstract (de)

Die Aufgabe der Erfindung besteht darin, Maßnahmen zu treffen, die beim Herstellen von Gewebe mit pneumatisch realisierten Einlegekanten das automatische Beheben eines Schussfehlers unterstützen. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, dass während des automatischen Schussfehlerbehebens wenigstens ein zusätzlicher Luftimpuls aus einer Strahldüse (13) den Schussfaden (4) etwa entgegen der Schussfadenanschlagbewegung eines Rietes (3) beaufschlagt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/48 (2006.01); D03D 51/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 51/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976859 A1 20000202; DE 19833079 A1 20000203; DE 19833079 C2 20010315; JP 2000212860 A 20000802; US 6129123 A 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020517

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000515

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI