Global Patent Index - EP 0976863 A1

EP 0976863 A1 2000-02-02 - Washing machine with userfriendly door opening button

Title (en)

Washing machine with userfriendly door opening button

Title (de)

Wäschebehandlungsmaschine mit bedienfreundlicher Türöffnungstaste

Title (fr)

Machine à laver avec bouton d'ouverture de porte convivial

Publication

EP 0976863 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114772 A

Priority

DE 19834642 A

Abstract (en)

The unlocking device (3) is associated with the door locking unit and is located outside the operating panel (5), in the immediate vicinity of the appliance door (2).

Abstract (de)

Zum Entriegeln einer Tür 2 einer frontal beschickbaren Wäschebehandlungsmaschine 1 muß eine Türöffnungstaste 3 betätigt werden. Diese ist in unmittelbarer Nähe zur Tür 2 angeordnet. Auf diese Weise kann die Tür sehr einfach geöffnet werden, da nach Betätigen der Türöffnungstaste 3 zum Entriegeln nur eine sehr kleine Bewegung zur Tür 2 hin nötig ist, um diese zu öffnen. Durch die erfindungsgemäße Anordnung der Türöffnungstaste 3 und der daraus folgenden optischen Zuordnung zur Tür 2 ergibt sich ferner in sinnfälliger Weise auch die Funktion der Türöffnungstaste 3, ohne daß diese notwendigerweise beschriftet oder mit einem Symbol versehen werden muß. Dies erleichtert darüber hinaus ihr Auffinden. Dadurch wird die heutzutage in den Vordergrund gerückte Bedienfreundlichkeit und Ergonomie de erfindungsgemäßen Wäschebehandlungsmaschine 1 wesentlich erhöht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976863 A1 20000202; DE 19834642 A1 20000203

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030314

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020411

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000731

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI