Global Patent Index - EP 0976874 A3

EP 0976874 A3 2000-03-15 - Method for renewing and/or improving a soil structure

Title (en)

Method for renewing and/or improving a soil structure

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Sanierung und/oder Strukturverbesserung eines Bodenbereiches

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la rénovation et/ou le renforcement d'une structure souterraine

Publication

EP 0976874 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99113052 A

Priority

DE 19833522 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976874A2] A trench is excavated from the soil structure and at least one drainage mat (11) which is impermeable on one side is fitted to at least one of the trench walls and/or base before the trench is filled back in again. The trench is dug using an automatic machine (1) that excavates soil at its front end and fills the trench back in again at its rear end. An Independent claim is also included for the drainage mat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 17/08; E01B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 37/00 (2006.01); E02D 17/08 (2006.01); E02D 3/10 (2006.01); E02D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 17/086 (2013.01); E01B 37/00 (2013.01); E02D 3/10 (2013.01); E02D 31/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833522 A1 20000127; EP 0976874 A2 20000202; EP 0976874 A3 20000315

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR RENEWING AND/OR IMPROVING A SOIL STRUCTURE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI