Global Patent Index - EP 0976877 A1

EP 0976877 A1 2000-02-02 - Vault construction method, support member and half shell for obtaining the vault

Title (en)

Vault construction method, support member and half shell for obtaining the vault

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Gewölbes, Stützglied und Halbschale zum Herstellen des Gewölbes

Title (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'une voûte, pièce d'appui et demi-coquille pour la réalisation de la voûte

Publication

EP 0976877 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401771 A

Priority

FR 9809688 A

Abstract (en)

The tunnel is made from a series of prefabricated halfshells (1, 2) with their lower ends set in sole plate channels and their upper ends recessed to receive a key of a cast concrete material. Before the key is cast the upper ends of the half-shells are fitted with temporary thrust assemblies (30, 50) which leave a gap in the base (14) of the recess between the half-shells' projecting edges (22). Once the key has been cast and has set the thrust assemblies are removed and the load transferred to the key.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'une voûte dans lequel on met en appui au moins deux demi-coquilles (60) l'une sur l'autre par l'intermédiaire d'au moins deux pièces d'appui (70) que l'on apparie et, chaque demi-coquille (60) comprenant un bord supérieur et un becquet de fond, on fixe chaque pièce d'appui sur une demi-coquille de façon amovible, on met en appui provisoire les deux demi-coquilles par leur pièce d'appui sans mettre en appui leurs becquets de fond, on coule un matériau de clavage entre lesdits bords supérieurs, sur le fond constitué des becquets, pour assurer une solidarisation transversale de continuité des demi-coquilles, puis, pour procéder à un transfert d'efforts des pièces d'appui sur les demi-coquilles, on retire les pièces d'appui. L'invention s'applique bien à la fabrication d'un passage sous remblai. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/05; E01D 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 11/08 (2006.01); E01D 21/00 (2006.01); E02D 29/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 21/00 (2013.01); E02D 29/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976877 A1 20000202; AU 4233299 A 20000224; BR 9903829 A 20000829; CA 2277685 A1 20000129; CA 2277685 C 20070227; FR 2781828 A1 20000204; FR 2781828 B1 20000922; ID 23711 A 20000511; JP 2000087697 A 20000328; MY 119761 A 20050729; TR 9901792 A1 20000221; US 6205605 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100202

2005-09-28 [19F] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER STAY OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20051102

2001-08-01 [19A] DATE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI