Global Patent Index - EP 0976878 A3

EP 0976878 A3 2000-04-12 - Load handling apparatus

Title (en)

Load handling apparatus

Title (de)

Ladevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Chargeur

Publication

EP 0976878 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99113846 A

Priority

GB 9816144 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976878A2] A load handling apparatus (10) includes a body (11), a power operated motive means (14), a front axle (46) and a rear axle (47), the axles (46,47) each carrying ground engaging means (16,17) on which the apparatus (10) may move over the ground, at least one loader arm (18) supported at or adjacent one end (19) on the body (11) for movement about a generally horizontal axis (B), the loader arm (18) being adapted to carry a loading implement (21) at or adjacent a second end (20) thereof, the apparatus (10) further including an operator's cab (28), characterised in that means (30,-33) are provided to move the cab (28) generally upwardly and downwardly between upper and lower positions relative to the ground engaging means (16,17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/16; A01B 51/02; B62D 7/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/065 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/0655 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976878 A2 20000202; EP 0976878 A3 20000412; EP 0976878 B1 20031112; CA 2278948 A1 20000125; DE 69912693 D1 20031218; GB 2339761 A 20000209; GB 9816144 D0 19980923

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160701

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040223

2004-02-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040213

2004-02-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040212

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912693 P 20031218

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020211

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 02F 9/16 A, 7A 01B 51/02 B, 7B 62D 7/15 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI