Global Patent Index - EP 0976881 A3

EP 0976881 A3 2000-12-20 - Device for the fixing of a built-in sink or the like to a carrier plate

Title (en)

Device for the fixing of a built-in sink or the like to a carrier plate

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Befestigen einer Einbauspüle oder dergleichen an einer Trägerplatte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un évier integré ou similaire à une plaque de support

Publication

EP 0976881 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112070 A

Priority

DE 19834370 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19834370C1] The basin (18) fixing in a cover plate (10) has a holder (26) forced onto the support flange (24) on the basin. The holder is a U-shaped clip with a support tongue which engages an angled surface (36) on a bracket (28) on the cover plate. The angled surface of the bracket accommodates different mounting heights for the basin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/33

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/33 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/33 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834370 C1 19990930; EP 0976881 A2 20000202; EP 0976881 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110104

2005-08-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BLANCO GMBH + CO KG

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050210

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010616

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI