Global patent index - EP 0976882 A2

EP 0976882 A2 2000-02-02 - Joint sealing body

Title (en)

Joint sealing body

Title (de)

Fugendichtungskörper

Title (fr)

Corps d'étanchéité pour joint

Publication

EP 0976882 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112557 A

Priority

DE 29813307 U

Abstract (en)

The sealing strip (1) has a profiled surface on one or both sides. he sealing strip comprises soft foam which preferably has an open pore structure and is impregnated.

Abstract (de)

Ein Fugendichtungskörper (1) aus weichem, vorzugsweise offenzelligem und imprägniertem Schaumstoff ist an einer oder an einander entgegengesetzten Oberflächen profitiert. In den dadurch gebildeten Rippen kann das Tränkgewicht der Imprägnierung von dem Tränkgewicht im übrigen Körper abweichen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/6812 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 1544724 A 19681108 - ASPHALT BITUMEN ONDERNEMING NV

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29813307 U1 19991209; EP 0976882 A2 20000202; EP 0976882 A3 20001213

INPADOC legal status

2002-03-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI