Global Patent Index - EP 0976884 A1

EP 0976884 A1 2000-02-02 - Mobile partition wall

Title (en)

Mobile partition wall

Title (de)

Mobile Trennwand

Title (fr)

Cloison mobile

Publication

EP 0976884 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114411 A

Priority

EP 98114411 A

Abstract (en)

The wall (2) is joined to a support post (1) by a magnetic strip (11) extending along a vertical edge profile (6) in the wall and in flat contact with the post. The support post (1) at least partly comprises a ferromagnetic material and is connected to at least one wall with two vertical edge profiles.

Abstract (de)

Eine Mobile Trennwand umfaßt mindestens ein Wandelement (2) und mindestens einen zumindest teilweise ferromagnetischen Stützpfosten (1), wobei das Wandelement (2) zwei vertikale Randprofile (6) aufweist, die zur Verbindung des Wandelements (2) mit dem mindestens einen Stützpfosten (1) Magneteinrichtungen (10) umfassen. Dabei sind die Magneteinrichtungen (10) als sich im wesentlichen längs der Randprofile (6) erstreckende, flächig an dem betreffenden Stützpfosten (1) anliegende Magnetstreifen (11) ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/74 (2006.01); G09F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7438 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7468 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976884 A1 20000202; AU 5286899 A 20000228; AU 742828 B2 20020110; BR 9912606 A 20010502; CA 2339159 A1 20000217; CN 1312877 A 20010912; JP 2003526748 A 20030909; MX PA01000933 A 20020604; PL 345709 A1 20020102; RO 120494 B1 20060228; SI 20591 A 20011231; TR 200100322 T2 20010621; US 2001004817 A1 20010628; US 6415566 B2 20020709; WO 0008270 A1 20000217; ZA 200100517 B 20020823

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030201

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PREFORM HOLDING D.O.O.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990223

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI