Global patent index - EP 0976885 A1

EP 0976885 A1 2000-02-02 - Mold for constructing a concrete floor

Title (en)

Mold for constructing a concrete floor

Title (de)

Schalung für Betondecken

Title (fr)

Coffrage pour la réalisation d'une dalle en béton

Publication

EP 0976885 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98113992 A

Priority

EP 98113992 A

Abstract (en)

The formwork comprises a shaped steel sheet (11) in which holes (12,12') are drilled. The upper longitudinal edges (13,13') of the sheet are folded to form a housing which receives a sealing strip of semi-permeable material (14).

Abstract (fr)

Le coffrage pour la réalisation d'une dalle en béton (1) comprend un fond qui présente des portions perforées (8) munies d'une membrane d'obturation (14) en un matériau semi-perméable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/40; E04D 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/40 (2006.01); E04D 13/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/17 (2013.01); E04B 5/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

SE 510519 C2 19990531 - PLANNJA AB [SE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976885 A1 20000202

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040223

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030811

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI