Global patent index - EP 0976890 A3

EP 0976890 A3 2000-02-23 - Mounting device for mounting a frame

Title (en)

Mounting device for mounting a frame

Title (de)

Montagevorrichtung zum Montieren einer Zarge

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage pour le montage d'un dormant

Publication

EP 0976890 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99114645 A

Priority

  • DE 29813732 U
  • DE 29822526 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976890A2] The brackets for securing the device (20) to the door or window frame comprise angled brackets (22) rigidly securable to the frame (1) on one side of the central plane of the device and having clamp surfaces extending parallel to the frame sections (9). The rod parts (45, 46) of the bracket protrude from the frame on the opposite side of this plane, and the clamp surfaces associated with their clamp pads (23) are oriented in the opposite direction to the surfaces in the angled brackets in contact with the frame sections and surrounding wall (8). The mounting device comprises a frame (21) placed inside the door or window frame, with two vertical sections (28) joined together by a length-adjustable spacer element (32) and presenting clamp surfaces (29) that urge against the inside surfaces (6) of the upright door or window frame members. Brackets used to attach the device to the door or window frame are joined to rods that can be moved in a direction at right angles to the central plane of the device frame. Clamp pads with clamping surfaces extending parallel to the central plane of the device frame are protrude radially outwards from these rods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/0015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976890 A2 20000202; EP 0976890 A3 20000223

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020201

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI