Global Patent Index - EP 0976893 A2

EP 0976893 A2 2000-02-02 - Access panel for pole

Title (en)

Access panel for pole

Title (de)

Zugangspanel für Pfosten

Title (fr)

Panneau d'accès pour poteau

Publication

EP 0976893 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99111080 A

Priority

IT BO980466 A

Abstract (en)

An access panel (1) for poles, constituted by a vertically elongated and shaped wraparound shell (2) which is externally provided, proximate to its ends, with two recessed seats (5,6) for the snap insertion of rustproof retention bushings (8) for respective effraction-resistant fixing screws (12) which are screwed substantially at the center of corresponding shaped brackets (21) for coupling to the pole which, at the end directed toward the center of the shell (2), are fork-shaped for a nonrotational coupling with pins (23) located inside the shell (2); the shell (2) has, toward the pole and in a peripheral region, a perimetric channel for a gasket. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT BO980466 A 19980729

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB GR PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976893 A2 20000202; EP 0976893 A3 20001220; EP 0976893 B1 20040324; AT 262633 T 20040415; DE 69915743 D1 20040429; ES 2214770 T3 20040916; IT 1306270 B1 20010604; IT BO980466 A1 20000131

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040824

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2005-02-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214770 T3

2004-06-25 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-06-14 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401672

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915743 P 20040429

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR PT

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB GR PT

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010611

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04H 12/00 A, 7E 05B 65/00 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR PT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI