Global Patent Index - EP 0976895 A1

EP 0976895 A1 2000-02-02 - Closing device

Title (en)

Closing device

Title (de)

Schliessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture

Publication

EP 0976895 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113888 A

Priority

DE 19833670 A

Abstract (en)

The coupling part (9) arranged at the servo motor (10) is connected with the central locking lever (7) across a swivel lever, is swivellable about a housing fixed axis (11) of rotation. The swivel lever (8) on its end facing away from the axis is connected with the central locking lever (7). The coupling part connected with the motor (10) engages the swivel lever, in the region between the swivel lever end and the axis of rotation.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schließvorrichtung für Kraftfahrzeuge mit einem von einer Verriegelungs- in eine Entriegelungsstellung drehbar angeordneten Schließzylinder (3), wobei der Schließzylinder (3) mit einem einen Zentralverriegelungshebel (7) umfassenden Hebelgehäuse (4) verbunden ist, und wobei der Zentralverriegelungshebel (7) über ein Kupplungsteil (9) durch einen an einem Gehäuse befestigten Stellmotor (10) ansteuerbar ist. Um sowohl eine platzsparende Anordnung des Stellmotors (10) zu erreichen als auch Funktionsstörungen der Schließvorrichtung (1) im Winter sicher zu vermeiden, schlägt die Erfindung vor, den Stellmotor (10) Über einen drehbar gelagerten Schwenkhebel (8) mit dem Zentralverriegelungshebel (7) zu verbinden, wobei die Schwenkbewegung um eine gehäusefeste Drehachse (11) erfolgt. Die Verbindung zwischen dem Stellmotor (10) und dem Schwenkhebel (8) erfolgt über ein einfach aufgebautes Kupplungsteil (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/34 (2014.01); E05B 81/06 (2014.01); E05B 81/16 (2014.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/04 (2006.01); E05B 83/16 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 77/34 (2013.01); E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 17/04 (2013.01); E05B 83/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976895 A1 20000202; EP 0976895 B1 20030910; DE 19833670 A1 20000210; DE 19833670 C2 20000817; ES 2207086 T3 20040516

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050718

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050716

2005-07-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050718

2005-07-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2005-07-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040714

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040709

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2207086

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI