Global Patent Index - EP 0976896 A2

EP 0976896 A2 2000-02-02 - Locking system

Title (en)

Locking system

Title (de)

Schliesssystem

Title (fr)

Système de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0976896 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111685 A

Priority

DE 19834691 A

Abstract (en)

The inner rotary knob (120) is connected rotation proof with a sleeve (12), on which the locking element (30) is arranged rotation proof. The outer rotary knob (50) is connected rotation proof with a shaft (52) extending through the sleeve (12) of the inner rotary knob (10), and is connected rotation proof with a coupling unit (40) arranged in the inner rotary knob.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Schließsystem für Türen mit einem einer Türinnenseite zugeordneten Innendrehknopf (10), der mit einem Schließelement (30) zur Betätigung eines Riegels drehfest verbunden ist, und einem Außendrehknopf (50), wobei der Innendrehknopf mit einer Hülse (12) drehfest verbunden ist, auf der das Schließelement (30) drehfest angeordnet ist, und der Außendrehknopf mit einer Welle (52) drehfest verbunden ist, die sich durch die Hülse (12) des Innendrehknopfs (10) erstreckt und mit einer im Innendrehknopf angeordneten Kupplungseinheit (40) drehfest verbunden ist, die in einem Freilaufzustand gegenüber dem Innendrehknopf frei verdrehbar und in einem Mitnahmezustand drehfest mit dem Innendrehknopf gekoppelt ist, und wobei die Kupplungseinheit zum Umschalten zwischen Freilauf- und Mitnähmezustand mit einer im Außendrehknopf (50) angeordneten Codeeingabe-Einheit über eine sich durch die Welle des Außendrehknopfs erstreckende elektrische und/oder optische Signalstrecke (22) verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/00 (2006.01); E05B 13/10 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/068 (2013.01); E05B 47/0615 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7068 (2015.04); Y10T 292/57 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976896 A2 20000202; EP 0976896 A3 20000209; EP 0976896 B1 20010502; AT 200922 T 20010515; DE 19834691 A1 20000203; DK 0976896 T3 20010528; ES 2156455 T3 20010616; JP 2000045582 A 20000215; US 6264256 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080617

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080616

2010-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090106

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080617

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080616

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080617

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080616

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080616

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-03-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080616

2009-02-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HEINRICH WILKE G.M.B.H. *HEWI

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070711

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-21 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARCHI & PARTNERS S.R.L.

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156455 T3

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900079 20010607

2001-05-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200922 T 20010515

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-02-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LOCKING SYSTEM

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI