Global Patent Index - EP 0976900 A1

EP 0976900 A1 2000-02-02 - Lock, especially vehicle glove compartment lock

Title (en)

Lock, especially vehicle glove compartment lock

Title (de)

Schloss, insbesondere Handschuhkastenschloss eines Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Serrure, en particulier serrure de vide-poches pour véhicule

Publication

EP 0976900 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112675 A

Priority

DE 19831727 A

Abstract (en)

The lock includes a transfer element (2) movable by an outside handle to interact with an unlocking element (6). A coupling element (7) displaceably mounted between the transfer and unlocking elements has a contact bearing face (13) and an entrainment face (11) so that when the transfer element moves from its operating position a follower (5) of the transfer element interacts with the contact bearing face to move the coupling element which moves the unlocking element into the position unlocking the lock. When the transfer element is moved from the uncoupling position the follower executes an idle stroke past the contact bearing face (13) of the coupling element. Can be used with central locking system

Abstract (de)

Schloß, insbesondere Handschuhkastenschloß eines Kraftfahrzeugs, mit einem verstellbaren Übertragungselement (2), das von einer äußeren Handhabe etwa senkrecht zur Längsachse (Achse 1) des Übertragungselements (2) verlagerbar ist und nur dann bei seiner Verlagerung mit einem Entriegelungselement (6) des Schlosses entriegelnd zusammenwirken kann, wenn das Übertragungselement (2) von einer Verstelleinrichtung aus einer Leerhublage in eine Betätigungslage verstellt ist. Zwischen dem Übertragungselement (2) und dem Entriegelungselement (6) ist ein Koppelelement (7) verstellbar angeordnet, das eine Anlagefläche (13) und eine Mitnehmerfläche (11) aufweist. Bei einer Verlagerung des Übertragungselements (2) aus seiner Betätigungslage wirkt ein Mitnehmer (5) des Übertragungselements (2) mit der Anlagefläche (13) zusammen und verlagert dadurch das Koppelelement (7), das über seine Mitnehmerfläche (11) das Entriegelungselement (6) in eine das Schloß entriegelnde Lage verstellt. Bei einer Verlagerung des Übertragungselements (2) aus der Entkopplungslage führt der Mitnehmer (5) einen an der Anlagefläche (13) des Koppelelements (7) vorbeiführenden Leerhub aus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/90 (2014.01); E05B 83/30 (2014.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 77/48 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/30 (2013.01); E05B 81/90 (2013.01); E05B 77/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831727 A1 20000120; DE 19831727 C2 20000615; EP 0976900 A1 20000202; EP 0976900 B1 20040102

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070702

2006-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060727

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-09-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908186

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010511

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI