Global patent index - EP 0976901 A3

EP 0976901 A3 2001-04-18 - Closure for a bonnet

Title (en)

Closure for a bonnet

Title (de)

Verschluss für eine Motorhaube

Title (fr)

Fermeture d'un capot

Publication

EP 0976901 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112958 A

Priority

DE 19833727 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976901A2] The lock comprises bonnet and bodywork-mounted units (10, 11) that are aligned along a common horizontal axis when the bonnet is closed. The bonnet-mounted unit (10) comprises a mounting part (14) securable to the bonnet, and a lock bolt (16) axially movable inside the mounting part so that it can be pushed outwards by an opening spring (22) into a released position, or simultaneously pushed inwards and rotated by applying pressure to an actuator button (18) to lock it into position. The bodywork-mounted unit (11) comprises a housing (32) securable to the bodywork, and a closure part (34) axially movable inside the housing so that it can be pressed inwards against a stop surface (48) by a closure spring (36), or moved outwards to be raised clear of the stop surface by the rotation of the lock bolt into the locked position. In this latter position the closure spring acts against the closure part to keep the bolt in the locked position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/24 (2014.01); E05C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/24 (2013.01); E05C 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976901 A2 20000202; EP 0976901 A3 20010418; DE 19833727 A1 20000203

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI