Global Patent Index - EP 0976902 A1

EP 0976902 A1 2000-02-02 - Electric lock module for the boot lid of a vehicle

Title (en)

Electric lock module for the boot lid of a vehicle

Title (de)

Elektrisches Schlossmodul für den Kofferraumdeckel eines Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Module de serrure électrique pour un coffre de véhicule

Publication

EP 0976902 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440211 A

Priority

FR 9809731 A

Abstract (en)

The lock has a bolt (20) pivoting about an axis (21) to engage with a striker, and a catch (30) with a return spring (36) turning about a pivot (31) to lock the bolt in its closed position. The catch and bolt are released by an electrical actuator (40) with at least one motor (41) and a cylindrical cam (45) with a spiral control groove (46) for a carriage (70). The carriage is coupled directly to the catch by a loop (72) and has at least one follower for the cam groove in the form of a spiral projecting rail. The length of the loop is greater than the thickness of the protruding portion of the catch it engages with to allow for play on engagement.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un module de serrure électrique (10) pourvu de moyens d'actionnement électrique (40) simples, fiables, sûrs et assurant un positionnement correct du cliquet (30) sans générer d'autres inconvénients. Ce module de serrure (10) est pourvu de moyens d'actionnement électriques (40) comportant au moins un moteur électrique (41) entraînant en rotation une came cylindrique (45) portant au moins une gorge hélicoïdale de commande (46) et sur laquelle est monté un chariot (70) mobile en translation, ce chariot étant couplé mécaniquement et directement au cliquet (30), la came cylindrique (45) étant agencée pour tourner dans un sens sous l'action du moteur électrique (41) et dans le sens inverse sous l'action uniquement du dispositif de rappel (36) du cliquet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/19; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 83/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976902 A1 20000202; FR 2781835 A1 20000204; FR 2781835 B1 20010105

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-03 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020204

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010801

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000513

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI