Global patent index - EP 0976903 A1

EP 0976903 A1 2000-02-02 - Doorhandle module for vehicles

Title (en)

Doorhandle module for vehicles

Title (de)

Türgriffmodul für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Module de poignée de porte pour un véhicule

Publication

EP 0976903 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113887 A

Priority

DE 19833671 A

Abstract (en)

The module includes a bearing support (5) attached to a first arm section (14) of a spring-loaded rocker arm joined to the rod (17) that connects the handle to the lock (16). The bearing support is movably mounted in a bearing guide (6) and can be be moved in the bearing length axis (7) direction in order to secure the rocker arm to the rod. A calibrating screw (8) laterally mounted in the bearing is used to slide the support into position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Türgriffmodul für eine mit einem Türschloß (16) versehene Kraftfahrzeugtür (2), welches einen an der Kraftfahrzeugtür (2) befestigbaren Lagerbügel (3) und ein an dem Lagerbügel (3) schwenkbar angeordnetes Griffteil (4) umfaßt, das über ein Gestänge (17) mit dem Türschloß (16) in Wirkverbindung steht. Um zu erreichen, daß bei der Montage des Türgriffmodules (1) die Anbindung des von dem Türschloß (16) kommenden Gestänges (17) an das Griffteil (4) des Modules (1) auf einfache und schnelle Weise erfolgen kann, schlägt die Erfindung vor, das Griffteil (4) über einen Schwenkhebel (9) mit dem Gestänge (17) des Türschlosses zu verbinden, wobei der Schwenkhebel (9) an einem in einer Führung (6) des Lagerbügels (3) in Richtung deren Längsachse (7) verschiebbaren Trägerteil (5) befestigt ist, derart, daß zur Verbindung des Schwenkhebels (9) mit dem Gestänge (17) der Schwenkhebel (9) auf das dem Lagerbügel (3) zugewandte Ende hin verschiebbar und anschließend mit diesem verbindbar ist. Zur Verschiebung des Trägerteiles (5) ist eine seitlich an dem Lagerbügel (3) angeordnete Stellschraube (8) vorgesehen, die von der dem Türschloß (16) zugewandten Seite der Kraftfahrzeugtür (2) betätigbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/12 (2014.01); E05B 85/16 (2014.01); E05B 79/06 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/12 (2013.01); E05B 85/16 (2013.01); E05B 79/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976903 A1 20000202; EP 0976903 B1 20010502; DE 19833671 A1 20000210; DE 19833671 C2 20001102; ES 2157127 T3 20010801

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050718

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050716

2005-07-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050718

2005-07-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2005-07-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2004-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040714

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040709

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157127

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-06-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI