Global Patent Index - EP 0976903 B1

EP 0976903 B1 2001-05-02 - Doorhandle module for vehicles

Title (en)

Doorhandle module for vehicles

Title (de)

Türgriffmodul für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Module de poignée de porte pour un véhicule

Publication

EP 0976903 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113887 A

Priority

DE 19833671 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976903A1] The module includes a bearing support (5) attached to a first arm section (14) of a spring-loaded rocker arm joined to the rod (17) that connects the handle to the lock (16). The bearing support is movably mounted in a bearing guide (6) and can be be moved in the bearing length axis (7) direction in order to secure the rocker arm to the rod. A calibrating screw (8) laterally mounted in the bearing is used to slide the support into position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/12 (2014.01); E05B 85/16 (2014.01); E05B 79/06 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/12 (2013.01); E05B 85/16 (2013.01); E05B 79/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976903 A1 20000202; EP 0976903 B1 20010502; DE 19833671 A1 20000210; DE 19833671 C2 20001102; ES 2157127 T3 20010801

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050718

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050716

2005-07-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050718

2005-07-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2005-07-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2004-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040714

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040709

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157127 T3

2001-06-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI