Global Patent Index - EP 0976906 A2

EP 0976906 A2 2000-02-02 - Hinge and vehicle

Title (en)

Hinge and vehicle

Title (de)

Scharnier und Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Charnière et véhicule

Publication

EP 0976906 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114047 A

Priority

US 12315398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6003204A] A hood hinge mechanism having a pivot pin having a D-shaped cross sectional shape positioned within a recess. The hood and pin are pivotal to a position whereat the D-shaped cross section is oriented to pass through a slotted opening to the recess to thereby allow the hood to be removed or installed on the vehicle. A bracket coupled with the hood abuts a support member when the hood is pivoted to its fully open position such that the hood is held open by the weight of the hood and is generally blocked from being detached from the vehicle unless acted upon by an operator.

Abstract (de)

2.1 Fahrzeuge weisen üblicherweise eine an einem Fahrzeugrahmen angebrachte Abdeckung oder Haube zum Abdecken eines Motorraumes auf. Solche Hauben können zwischen einer geschlossenen und einer geöffneten Stellung verschwenkt und oftmals auch vollständig von dem Fahrzeug abgenommen werden, um einen Zugang zu Fahrzeugbestandteilen in dem Motorraum zu ermöglichen. 2.2 Es wird ein Scharnier (20) offenbart, das ein Abnehmen der Abdeckung (18) ohne die Zuhilfenahme von Werkzeugen ermöglicht und aus einer geringen Anzahl von Einzelteilen besteht. Darüber hinaus wird ein Fahrzeug (10) mit einem solchen Scharnier (20) vorgeschlagen. 2.3 Scharniere und Fahrzeuge mit solchen Scharnieren werden zur Rasen- und Grundstückspflege eingesetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/10; B62D 25/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/10 (2006.01); E05D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/1072 (2013.01); E05D 5/062 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/536 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53613 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53615 (2013.01); Y10T 16/551 (2013.01); Y10T 16/557 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5048154 A 19910917 - SWARTZENDRUBER JAMES A [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6003204 A 19991221; CA 2265957 A1 20000127; CA 2265957 C 20010626; EP 0976906 A2 20000202; EP 0976906 A3 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060214

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI