Global Patent Index - EP 0976907 A2

EP 0976907 A2 2000-02-02 - Actuator for a vertically slidable closure element

Title (en)

Actuator for a vertically slidable closure element

Title (de)

Betätigungsvorrichtung für ein in vertikaler Richtung verschiebliches Verschlusselement

Title (fr)

Actionneur pour élément de fermeture coulissant verticalement

Publication

EP 0976907 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99108013 A

Priority

DE 29813452 U

Abstract (en)

A spring loaded pull, in the form of a cable (22), takes the door's weight and is guided by a pivoted lever to which the helical spring is linked at an adjustable point, in the form of a pivot mounted pin (32) turned by a screw (34), on the plane of the pivoting lever. One end of the cable grips the closure element. The cable then runs over a deflector roller (24) fixed to the main body, and than over a deflector roller (26) on the pivot lever (28). The other free end of the cable is fixed to the main body.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Betätigungsvorrichtung für ein in vertikaler Richtung verschiebliches Verschlußelement (10) für Öffnungen aller Art, vorzugweise Möbel, z.B. Schränke, die in seitlichen Führungen (20) geführt sind, wobei das Türgewicht durch ein federbelastetes Zugelement (22) aufgenommen oder über ein Gegenwicht ausgeglichen wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 13/00; E05D 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 13/00 (2006.01); E05D 15/16 (2006.01); E05F 1/04 (2006.01); E05F 1/16 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

E05F (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 13/1207 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/478 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/67 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29813452 U1 19981105; EP 0976907 A2 20000202; EP 0976907 A3 20030806; HK 1027145 A1 20030207; TW 504539 B 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-04-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2004-04-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 19990422

- Countries: SI

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05D 13/00 A

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05D 15/16 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05D 13/12 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990422