Global Patent Index - EP 0976908 A1

EP 0976908 A1 2000-02-02 - Venitian blind

Title (en)

Venitian blind

Title (de)

Rafflamellenstore

Title (fr)

Store vénitien

Publication

EP 0976908 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401893 A

Priority

FR 9809556 A

Abstract (en)

The Venetian blind comprises a series of superposed horizontal slats individually supported by flexible ladders (10). Each ladder is composed of two vertical strands (12,14) connected together by crosspieces (16) which support the slats. The upper ends (13,15) of the strands pass through the wall (22) of a casing (20) to be connected to a slat inclination control (30). The blind has manual control strings (32) which are mounted in a vertical beading in the blind opening.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un store vénitien comprenant une série de lames horizontales (46) superposées et supportées individuellement par des échelles souples (10) composées chacune de deux brins verticaux (12, 14) reliés entre eux par des traverses (16) qui supportent les lames, les extrémités supérieures (13, 15) desdits brins verticaux (12, 14) traversant la paroi (22) d'un boîtier (20) pour y être reliées à des moyens (30) de commande en inclinaison des lames, sous forme d'un élément de commande (30) monté à translation horizontale dans le boîtier (20) et sur lequel sont fixées les extrémités supérieures (13, 15) des brins verticaux (12, 14), de manière symétrique par rapport à leur passage (24, 26) à travers la paroi (22) du boîtier (20), caractérisé par le fait que le store comporte en outre des moyens (32 ; 36, 37, 38) d'actionnement manuels dudit élément de commande (30) monté dans le boîtier (20), lesquels moyens d'actionnement (32 ; 36, 37, 38) comportent un organe (32, 38) apte à être monté à déplacement dans une parclose verticale (44) de l'ouverture associée au store. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/307; E06B 9/322

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/307 (2006.01); E06B 9/322 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/322 (2013.01); E06B 9/307 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976908 A1 20000202; FR 2781521 A1 20000128; FR 2781521 B1 20001013

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030928

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030318

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI