Global patent index - EP 0976910 A2

EP 0976910 A2 2000-02-02 - Device for the automatic control of the stop cursors of motor reducers in roller shutters

Title (en)

Device for the automatic control of the stop cursors of motor reducers in roller shutters

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur automatischen Steuerung der Anschlagsschieber von Motor-Untersetzungsgetrieben in Rolladen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande automatique des curseurs de butoir des motoréducteurs dans les volets roulants

Publication

EP 0976910 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830128 A

Priority

IT AN980013 U

Abstract (en)

This invention relates to a device for the automatic control of the stop cursors of motor reducers used to handle winding window shutters, such as roller shutters, or blinds. The device features two pistons (12) to engage or disengage the pinions (6) of the threaded rods (7) used to screw the stop cursors (9) with respect to the gear that drags them into rotation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/88 (2006.01); E06B 9/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/88 (2013.01); E06B 2009/6881 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976910 A2 20000202; EP 0976910 A3 20001011; IT 244839 Y1 20020314; IT AN980013 U1 19990913; IT AN980013 V0 19980312

INPADOC legal status

2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-08-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI