Global Patent Index - EP 0976912 A2

EP 0976912 A2 2000-02-02 - Hydro-static axial piston machine with a secondary guiding device for an intermediary disk

Title (en)

Hydro-static axial piston machine with a secondary guiding device for an intermediary disk

Title (de)

Hydrostatische Axialkolbenmaschine mit einer Nachführvorrichtung für eine Zwischenscheibe

Title (fr)

Machine hydrostatique aux pistons axiaux avec dispositif de guidage secondaire pour un disque intermédiaire

Publication

EP 0976912 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112604 A

Priority

DE 19833711 A

Abstract (en)

The hydrostatic axial piston machine is provided with a follow up system (31), which carries out a relative movement between the control disc (18) and the intermediate disc (25), with control slots (S1,S2, fig.2) corresp. with control ducts in the control disc (18). For improving the movement control of the intermediate disc relative to the control disc (18), the follow up system (31) is so effective over the entire swivel range of the control disc (18), that the shift (a,fig.1) is greater than the shift (b,fig.1) of the intermediate disc (25).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine hydrostatische Axialkolbenmaschine (1) mit einer in einem Gehäuse (2) gelagerten Zylindertrommel, in der in Zylinderbohrungen Kolben verschiebbar gelagert sind, deren Kolbenenden an einer drehbar gelagerten Antriebsscheibe schwenkbar abgestützt sind, wobei die Zylindertrommel und eine an der der Antriebsscheibe abgewandten Seite der Zylindertrommel angeordnete Steuerscheibe (18) durch eine in einer Schwenkebene (22) quer verschwenkbar ist, wobei die Steuerscheibe (18) an ihrer der Zylindertrommel abgewandten Seite eine längs der Schwenkebene (22) kreisbogenförmig gekrümmte Lagergleitfläche (27) aufweist, an der eine Zwischenscheibe (25) mit einer entsprechend gekrümmten Lagergleitfläche (28) gelagert ist, wobei eine Nachführvorrichtung (31) vorgesehen ist, die eine relative Verschiebung zwischen der Steuerscheibe (18) und der Zwischenscheibe (25) herbeiführt, und wobei die Zwischenscheibe (25) mit Steuerkanälen in der Steuerscheibe (18) korrespondierende Steuerschlitze (S1, S2) aufweist. Zwecks Verbesserung der Bewegungssteuerung der Zwischenscheibe (25) relativ zur Steuerscheibe (18) ist die Nachführvorrichtung (31) über den gesamten Schwenkbereich der Steuerscheibe (18) so wirksam, daß der Verschiebeweg der Steuerscheibe (18) größer ist als der Verschiebeweg der Zwischenscheibe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01B 3/0038 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2029087 B2 19740711

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976912 A2 20000202; EP 0976912 A3 20001129; EP 0976912 B1 20040317; DE 19833711 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080702

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080701

2009-03-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070712

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908851 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021220

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010330

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 01B 3/00 A, 7F 01B 3/10 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI