Global Patent Index - EP 0976914 A1

EP 0976914 A1 2000-02-02 - System and process providing rapid power reserve in combined gas- and steam turbines plants

Title (en)

System and process providing rapid power reserve in combined gas- and steam turbines plants

Title (de)

Vorrichtung sowie Verfahren zur schnellen Bereitstellung von Leistungsreserven bei kombinierten Gas- und Dampfturbinenanlagen

Title (fr)

Installation et procédé pour fournir rapidement une réserve de puissance dans des centrales combinées avec turbines à gaz et à vapeur

Publication

EP 0976914 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810728 A

Priority

EP 98810728 A

Abstract (en)

A steam generator (20) is connected via at least one inlet valve (12) to a steam turbine (6). A heat accumulator (7) is coupled to supply saturation water to the steam generator via a pump. The heat accumulator may be a balanced pressure heat store. A method of operating a combined gas and steam turbine system, and the use of the apparatus for controlling the frequency of generated electric current are also claimed.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Vorrichtung zur schnellen Bereitstellung von Leistungsreserven bei kombinierten Gas- und Dampfturbinenanlagen mit einem Wasser-Dampfkreislauf, der zum Antrieb der Dampfturbine (6) über wenigstens ein Einlaßventil (12) mit dieser verbunden ist und an dem zusätzlich zur Speisewassereinheit wenigstens eine Wärmespeichereinheit (7,10) angekoppelt ist, aus der bedarfsweise über ein Regelventil Dampf in den Kreislauf zusätzlich einspeisbar ist. Ferner wird ein Verfahren zum Betreiben einer diesbezüglichen kombinierten Gas- und Dampfturbinenanlage beschrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 23/10; F01K 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01K 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 23/106 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0439754 A1 19910807 - ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]
  • [A] DE 1288614 B 19690206 - WAAGNER BIRO AG
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 079 (M - 204) 31 March 1983 (1983-03-31)
  • [A] SINDELAR R: "GEWAEHRLEISTUNG DER SEKUNDENDYNAMIK EINES DAMPFKRAFTWERKSBLOCKES", VGB KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK, vol. 71, no. 1, 1 January 1991 (1991-01-01), pages 4 - 13, XP000178871

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976914 A1 20000202; EP 0976914 B1 20030226; DE 59807318 D1 20030403

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050725

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060729

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060729

2005-07-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050725

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807318

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI