Global patent index - EP 0976921 A3

EP 0976921 A3 2001-03-07 - Method and apparatus for monitoring fuel supply system

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for monitoring fuel supply system

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung eines Kraftstoffzumesssystems

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif de surveillance d'un système d'alimentation en carburant

Publication

EP 0976921 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103561 A

Priority

DE 19834660 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976921A2] Fuel is supplied to a reservoir by a pump and then metered into the combustion chamber by a controllable injector. A sensor provides a signal indicating the pressure in the reservoir. Based on a change in the pressure signal when a parameter affecting the pressure changes, an incorrect pressure signal is detected. An incorrect pressure signal may be detected if the ratio between the change in pressure signal and the change in the parameter exceeds a threshold. A drive signal for an actuator affecting the pressure may be used as the parameter. An apparatus for monitoring a fuel proportioning system is also claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/22; F02D 41/30; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3863 (2013.01); F02D 41/222 (2013.01); F02D 41/3082 (2013.01); F02D 2041/223 (2013.01); F02D 2041/227 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0604 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976921 A2 20000202; EP 0976921 A3 20010307; EP 0976921 B1 20040630; DE 19834660 A1 20000203; JP 2000054903 A 20000222; JP 4313901 B2 20090812

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150224

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150224

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150224

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59909841

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140325

2014-03-25 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59909841

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-02-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909841

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030620

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI