Global Patent Index - EP 0976924 A2

EP 0976924 A2 2000-02-02 - Servo valve for an injector and injector

Title (en)

Servo valve for an injector and injector

Title (de)

Servoventil für ein Einspritzventil und Einspritzventil

Title (fr)

Servovalve pour un injecteur et injecteur

Publication

EP 0976924 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112980 A

Priority

DE 19834667 A

Abstract (en)

The servo valve is used for the fuel injection valve of an internal combustion engine. There is a control space (4) above a piston (6) which is connected to the fuel injector needle. The contact space is connected with a second space (20) via a first throttle channel (3). A high-pressure bore (1) is connected to the second space via a wide access bore. Fuel may leave the control space via a bore (9) leading to a second throttle bore. There is a valve body (26) moved by a pushrod (16) attached to a piezoelectric actuator (18). The valve body is hemispherical and its flat surface may seal against a flat surface (24) at the end of the metal block containing the second space. The hemispherical surface is surrounded by a valve chamber (22) and when the valve body is in its upper position it engages a valve seat (28) to block off return flow to the fuel supply.

Abstract (de)

Das Einspritzventil für die Einspritzung von Kraftstoff in eine Verbrennungskraftmaschine weist einen Steuerraum (4) auf, der über eine Zulaufbohrung (2) mit einem Raum (20) und eine Zulaufdrossel (3) mit einem Hochdruckspeicher in Verbindung steht und der über eine Ablaufdrossel (10) in einer Ablaufbohrung (9) und über die Ventilkammer (22) des Servoventils (12) mit einem drucklosen Rücklauf (14) zu einem Kraftstofftank in Verbindung gebracht werden kann. Der im Steuerraum (4) herrschende Druck wirkt auf einen beweglichen Düsenkörper (6) ein, der mit einer Düsennadel versehen ist, die bei der Bewegung des Düsenkörpers (6) Einspritzlöcher (7) freigibt und verschließt. Das Servoventil (12) umfaßt einen beweglichen Ventilkörper (26), der von einem Aktor (18) betätigt wird und der selektiv an einem Anschlag (24) zwischen dem Raum (20) und der Ventilkammer (22) oder an einem Ventilsitz (28) zwischen der Ventilkammer (22) und dem Rücklauf (14) zur Anlage kommen kann. Wenn der Ventilkörper (26) am Ventilsitz (28) anliegt, kann der Kraftstoff zum Schließen des Einspritzventils über die Zulaufdrossel (3) und außerdem über die Ventilkammer (22) des Servoventils und die Ablaufdrossel (10) in den Steuerraum (4) strömen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 63/0036 (2013.01); F02M 63/0045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976924 A2 20000202; EP 0976924 A3 20010613; EP 0976924 B1 20030917

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140705

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906995

- Effective date: 20140201

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906995 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIXL, HEINZ

2003-04-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INJECTOR WITH A SERVO VALVE

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010507

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI