Global Patent Index - EP 0976929 A1

EP 0976929 A1 2000-02-02 - Hydraulic actuator and control method for a hydraulic side-shifting drive

Title (en)

Hydraulic actuator and control method for a hydraulic side-shifting drive

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Steuern eines hydraulischen Seitenschieberantriebs und Hydraulikantrieb hierfür

Title (fr)

Actionneur hydraulique et procédé de commande pour un châssis coulissant hydraulique

Publication

EP 0976929 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114568 A

Priority

DE 19834149 A

Abstract (en)

The method is carried out so that by one of the pistons (4,5) at the end of its inward movement, a non return valve (8,9) of the associated cylinders (2,3) is opened against its closed direction mechanically whilst a non return valve (8,9) of the respective other cylinder (2,3) is held open, during the operation duration of the way valve (19), by the working pressure of the hydraulic pump (15) in such a manner. The hydraulic liquid is returned back, through the non-return valves (8,9), connected in series the opposed closing directions, in a sump (34) of the hydraulic pump (15). The way valve (19) is operated, so long until about, gases with hydraulic liquid located in the cylinders (2,3), are led off to the sump (24) of the hydraulic pump (15), in which they are removed from the hydraulic circuit.

Abstract (de)

Zum Steuern eines hydraulischen Seitenschieberantriebs (29) mittels einer Hydraulikpumpe (15) und eines Wegeventils (19) sind zwei Zylinder (2, 3) vorgesehen, deren Kolben (4, 5) durch einen Seitenschieberrahmen gleichsinnig verschiebbar sind. Zwecks Erzielung einer wirksamen Entlüftung wird durch den einen Kolben (4, 5) am Ende seiner Einwärtsbewegung ein Rückschlagventil (8, 9) des zugehörigen Zylinders (2, 3) entgegen seiner Schließrichtung mechanisch geöffnet, während ein Rückschlagventil (8, 9) des jeweils anderen Zylinders (2, 3) während der Betätigungsdauer des Wegeventils (19) durch den Arbeitsdruck der Hydraulikpumpe (15) offen gehalten wird. Dadurch wird erreicht,dass die Hydraulikflüssigkeit zusammen mit eingeschlossenen Gasen durch die mit entgegengesetzten Schließrichtungen in Reihe geschalteten Rückschlagventile (8, 9) in einen Sumpf (24) der Hydraulikpumpe (15) zurückgeführt wird, wo die Gase aus dem Kreislauf entfernt werden. Die Anordnung ist insbesondere für Gabelstapler vorgesehen und kann dadurch automatisiert werden, dass dem Wegeventil (19) über Bypass-Leitungen ein weiteres Wegeventil (30) parallel geschaltet ist, das in beiden Richtungen durch einen Betriebsschalter (31) und zwei Zeitglieder (32, 33) betätigbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/14 (2006.01); F15B 11/20 (2006.01); F15B 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 21/044 (2013.01); B66F 9/148 (2013.01); F15B 11/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976929 A1 20000202; EP 0976929 B1 20031203; AT 255686 T 20031215; DE 19834149 A1 20000210; DE 19834149 C2 20031211; ES 2212424 T3 20040716

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KAUP G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G. GESELLSCHAFT FUR MASCHIN

- Effective date: 20040731

2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050726

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050724

2006-03-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050726

2005-07-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050725

2005-07-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050724

2005-07-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050724

2005-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KAUP G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G. GESELLSCHAFT FUR MASCHIN

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040731

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040724

2004-07-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040724

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212424 T3

2004-07-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040716

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040712

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-06 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040706

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040614

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-11 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040611

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-03-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-02-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907917 P 20040115

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-03 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI