Global Patent Index - EP 0976969 A1

EP 0976969 A1 2000-02-02 - Apparatus and process for the supply of helium to a plurality of production lines

Title (en)

Apparatus and process for the supply of helium to a plurality of production lines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Versorgung von Helium zu mehreren Produktionslinien

Title (fr)

Installation et procédé de fourniture d'hélium à plusiers lignes de production

Publication

EP 0976969 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401928 A

Priority

FR 9809694 A

Abstract (en)

The installation comprises a helium source (2) with an internal volume of at least 7000 liters; a network (4) of secondary pipes (4a, 4b, 4c) each feeding at least one production line (5a, 5b, 5c) using gaseous helium; a main pipe (3, 3a, 3b) connected upstream to the helium source and downstream to the network. Each production line is fed with helium from the helium source The installation comprises a helium source (2) with an internal volume of at least 7000 liters; a network (4) of secondary pipes (4a, 4b, 4c) each feeding at least one production line (5a, 5b, 5c) using gaseous helium; a main pipe (3, 3a, 3b) connected upstream to the helium source and downstream to the network. Each production line is fed with helium from the helium source. Preferred Features: The helium source has an internal volume of at least 8000 liters, and preferably more than 20000 liters or, especially, more than 40000 liters. The source is movable or fixed. The main pipe is also connected to at least one of the following: A heat exchanger (7), a balance capacity (8), means of purifying the helium (9) and a compressor (10). The installation also includes means of controlling the flow and/or the pressure in the main pipe and/or each secondary pipe in the network. The production lines are: Bottle filling lines; balloon envelopes; airbag fillers; helium dosing lines for metalwork; electronic production lines making wafers or printed circuits, or optic fiber production lines. The production lines are independently connected to the main line via the network. The helium extracted from the source is liquid or supercritical. An Independent claim is included for a process for supplying helium using the above device by feeding a main pipe with helium from a source, and channeling the helium to a network of secondary pipes each feeding at least one production line using helium gas. The helium is extracted from the source in liquid or supercritical form and is vaporized to obtain helium gas. The pressure and/or flow of helium in the main pipe is adjusted as a function of the sum of the pressures and/or flows in the secondary pipes.

Abstract (fr)

Installation (1) de fourniture d'hélium à des lignes (5a, 5b, 5c) de production comprenant une source (2) d'hélium d'au moins 7000 litres ; un réseau (4) de canalisations secondaires (4a, 4b, 4c) alimentant des lignes de production utilisant de l'hélium gazeux ; et une canalisation principale (3, 3a, 3b) d'acheminement d'hélium relié, en amont, à la source (2) d'hélium et, en aval, au réseau (4) de canalisations secondaires. Utilisation d'une telle installation (1) dans une opération de remplissage de bouteilles de gaz de plongée, d'enveloppes gazeuses pour ballon dirigeable ou de récipients de gonflage de coussins de sécurité, de trempe de pièces métalliques, de fabrication de produits électroniques ou de fibres optiques. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 9/02; F17C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 9/00 (2006.01); F17B 1/00 (2006.01); F17C 5/06 (2006.01); F17C 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 5/06 (2013.01); F17C 9/02 (2013.01); F17C 2201/054 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0142 (2013.01); F17C 2221/017 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0115 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0153 (2013.01); F17C 2225/0115 (2013.01); F17C 2225/0153 (2013.01); F17C 2250/01 (2013.01); F17C 2265/01 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0171 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0173 (2013.01); F17C 2270/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976969 A1 20000202; EP 0976969 B1 20061206; AR 024506 A1 20021016; AT 347668 T 20061215; BR 9902937 A 20000321; CA 2279108 A1 20000129; CN 1092314 C 20021009; CN 1245876 A 20000301; DE 69934277 D1 20070118; DE 69934277 T2 20070705; ES 2278432 T3 20070801; FR 2781868 A1 20000204; FR 2781868 B1 20000915; JP 2000055299 A 20000222; KR 20000012019 A 20000225; SG 74156 A1 20000718; TW 410257 B 20001101; US 6178755 B1 20010130; ZA 9904643 B 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160715

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061206

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070728

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070307

2008-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-10-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PRAXAIR, INC.

- Effective date: 20070905

2007-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2278432 T3

2007-06-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

2007-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-05-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070507

2007-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

2007-03-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070227

2007-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69934277 P 20070118

2007-01-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2006-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-12-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061206

2006-12-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061206

2006-12-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061206

2006-12-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061206

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI