Global Patent Index - EP 0976980 A2

EP 0976980 A2 2000-02-02 - Device and method for dispensing pasty products

Title (en)

Device and method for dispensing pasty products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Ausbringen von pastösem Fördergut

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de distribution de produits pâteux

Publication

EP 0976980 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99110733 A

Priority

DE 19833539 A

Abstract (en)

The dispersal of extruded paste before incineration comprises forming a hollow tube that is shattered by air or steam just before it falls into the incinerator. An extension (14) to a slurry pump delivery pipe (12) transforms the solid extrusion into a hollow tube by forcing it over a conical insert (44) which is held in position by three equally spaced radial arms (38), one of which has a bore (50) through it. The bore allows compressed air or steam to be supplied from a connection (56) to the center of the insert from where it is distributed to four jets (48) at the circumference of the insert in a position just outside the end (30) of the extension. The hollow tube of slurry is then shattered at this point by the air to fall as small pieces into the furnace onto which the flange (34) of the extension is bolted. The bore of the extension is widened in the region (28) of the insert to prevent further compression.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Vorrichtung (10) und ein Verfahren zum Ausbringen von pastösem Fördergut aus einer Förderleitung (12), wobei das Fördergut durch ein mit einer Ausstoßöffnung (30) versehenes Rohrstück (14) gepreßt und mittels eines Dorns (18) zu einem Hohlstrang geformt wird. Der Hohlstrang wird nach dem Durchtritt durch die Ausstoßöffnung (30) innenseitig mit Druckluft beaufschlagt und dabei unter Bildung von Schüttgut zerteilt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/44; F23G 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/44 (2006.01); F23G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/442 (2013.01); F23G 7/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833539 A1 20000127; EP 0976980 A2 20000202; EP 0976980 A3 20000322; EP 0976980 B1 20030827; ES 2205638 T3 20040501

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070605

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070605

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070604

2006-07-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060622

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060612

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205638 T3

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906750 P 20031002

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021014

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000422

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI