Global Patent Index - EP 0976987 A2

EP 0976987 A2 2000-02-02 - Ceiling concealed type air conditioner

Title (en)

Ceiling concealed type air conditioner

Title (de)

In die Decke integrierte Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement d'air à camoufler dans un plafond

Publication

EP 0976987 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98309159 A

Priority

JP 21547498 A

Abstract (en)

A partition for separating primary air on an inlet (1a) side and secondary air on an outlet (1b) side in a cabinet (1) is connected to a front plate (1f) of the cabinet (1) on the outlet side. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 2221/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H06159719 A 19940607 - SANYO ELECTRIC CO

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976987 A2 20000202; EP 0976987 A3 20010418; EP 0976987 B1 20040526; AU 744236 B2 20020221; AU 9045198 A 20000224; ES 2221700 T3 20050101; HK 1023807 A1 20050121; JP 2000046361 A 20000218

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151014

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151104

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-08-16 [REG GB 727B] CASE DECIDED BY THE COMPTROLLER ** SPECIFICATION AMENDED (SECT. 27/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 727B

2006-05-03 [REG GB 727A] APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION NOW OPEN TO OPPOSITION (SECT. 27/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 727A

2006-04-05 [REG GB 727] APPLICATION MADE FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION (SECT. 27/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 727

2005-11-16 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20051025

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-21 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1023807

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2221700

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030530

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES GB IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI