Global Patent Index - EP 0976987 A3

EP 0976987 A3 2001-04-18 - Ceiling concealed type air conditioner

Title (en)

Ceiling concealed type air conditioner

Title (de)

In die Decke integrierte Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement d'air à camoufler dans un plafond

Publication

EP 0976987 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309159 A

Priority

JP 21547498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976987A2] A partition for separating primary air on an inlet (1a) side and secondary air on an outlet (1b) side in a cabinet (1) is connected to a front plate (1f) of the cabinet (1) on the outlet side. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 2221/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976987 A2 20000202; EP 0976987 A3 20010418; EP 0976987 B1 20040526; AU 744236 B2 20020221; AU 9045198 A 20000224; ES 2221700 T3 20050101; HK 1023807 A1 20050121; JP 2000046361 A 20000218

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161109

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-08-16 [REG GB 727B] CASE DECIDED BY THE COMPTROLLER ** SPECIFICATION AMENDED (SECT. 27/1977)

2006-05-03 [REG GB 727A] APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION NOW OPEN TO OPPOSITION (SECT. 27/1977)

2006-04-05 [REG GB 727] APPLICATION MADE FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION (SECT. 27/1977)

2005-11-16 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20051025

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-21 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1023807

2005-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221700 T3

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030530

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES GB IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI