Global Patent Index - EP 0976989 A3

EP 0976989 A3 2000-11-08 - Water circuit of a combined service wall-mounted gas-fired boiler

Title (en)

Water circuit of a combined service wall-mounted gas-fired boiler

Title (de)

Wasserkreislauf eines kombinierten Gaswandkessels

Title (fr)

Circuit d'eau d'une chaudière mixte murale à gaz

Publication

EP 0976989 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98123350 A

Priority

IT MI980531 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976989A2] The water circuit (10) for a combined service wall-mounted gas-fired boiler includes a primary circuit (11) in which the hot water for room heating is circulated and a secondary circuit (12) in which hot water for domestic use is circulated. In order to fill with water the primary circuit (11) of the boiler and the room heating units connected thereto through pipes (M,R) a three-way valve (32) is provided. This valve (32) is arranged so as to connect the primary circuit (11) or the secondary circuit (12) to the water mains (D) or to disconnect both therefrom. When the filling with water of the primary circuit (11) and the room heating units is required, the three-way valve (32) connects the primary circuit (11) to the water mains (D), while during the normal operation of the boiler the three-way valve (32) connects the secondary circuit (12) to the water mains (D). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/12 (2006.01); F24H 9/14 (2006.01); F24H 1/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/14 (2013.01); F24H 9/122 (2013.01); F24H 9/142 (2013.01); F24H 1/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976989 A2 20000202; EP 0976989 A3 20001108; EP 0976989 B1 20020206; DE 69803756 D1 20020321; DE 69803756 T2 20021114; ES 2172854 T3 20021001; IT 244172 Y1 20020307; IT MI980531 U1 20000131

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161206

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161207

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021231

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021028

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021004

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172854 T3

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803756 20020321

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RIELLO S.P.A.

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010402

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI