Global Patent Index - EP 0977041 A2

EP 0977041 A2 2000-02-02 - Transducer arrangement for protection apparatus and power breakers

Title (en)

Transducer arrangement for protection apparatus and power breakers

Title (de)

Wandlereinrichtungen für Schutzgeräte und Leistungsschaltereinrichtungen

Title (fr)

Ensemble transducteur pour appareils de protection et disjoncteurs

Publication

EP 0977041 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250210 A

Priority

DE 19836082 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement includes respectively a measuring resistance connected at a secondary side of the protection instrument or power switch arrangement, whereby their respective not permissible voltage or current value leads to a triggering of the respective protection instrument or switch arrangement. The converter arrangements are implemented through non-conventional, low-power current converters (WI) and/or through respective voltage converters (WU). The measuring resistances (RM) of the current and/or voltage converter are connected in parallel with adjustment modules (AM) formed respectively from resistance networks (RN) and adjustment fields (AF). The measuring resistances and the resistance networks are respectively positioned on common printed circuit boards (LP). The printed circuit boards are equipped with double conductor paths (LD) in the area of drill holes (BL), in such way, that at an adjustment in the area of a drilling hole, a partial resistance (RT) associated with it, is connected with a fixed resistance (RF) of the resistance network.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft Wandlereinrichtungen für Schutzgeräte und Leistungsschaltereinrichtungen, die beim Überschreiten nicht zulässiger Strom- und Spannungswerte zu Auslöseansteuerungen führen. Die Wandlereinrichtungen (WE) sind durch nichtkonventionelle, leistungsarme Strom- bzw. Spannungswandler realisiert, denen aus Widerstandsnetzwerken (RN) und Abgleichfeldern (AF) gebildete Abgleichmodule (AM) parallel geschaltet sind und deren Abgleich durch Bohrlochunterbrechungen von durchkontaktierten Doppel-Leiterbahnen erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 15/18; G01R 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 1/20 (2006.01); G01R 15/04 (2006.01); G01R 15/18 (2006.01); H05K 1/00 (2006.01); G01R 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 15/18 (2013.01); G01R 1/203 (2013.01); G01R 15/04 (2013.01); H05K 1/029 (2013.01); G01R 19/0084 (2013.01); G01R 19/0092 (2013.01); H05K 1/0293 (2013.01); H05K 2201/10022 (2013.01); H05K 2203/0242 (2013.01); H05K 2203/171 (2013.01); H05K 2203/175 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977041 A2 20000202; EP 0977041 A3 20031119; EP 0977041 B1 20051005; DE 19836082 A1 20000203; DE 59912615 D1 20060216

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090625

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060706

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060623

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912615

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-02-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20051115

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-10-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01R 15/18 A

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01R 1/20 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI