Global Patent Index - EP 0977083 A1

EP 0977083 A1 20000202 - An optical card comprising an imaged layer

Title (en)

An optical card comprising an imaged layer

Title (de)

Optische Karte mit einer Bildschicht

Title (fr)

Carte optique comprenant une couche portant une image

Publication

EP 0977083 A1 20000202 (EN)

Application

EP 99202008 A 19990623

Priority

  • EP 99202008 A 19990623
  • EP 98202578 A 19980731

Abstract (en)

According to the present invention there is provided an imaged element comprising an optical card and underneath a layer package comprising in the order given an optional image receiving layer, a prelayer, an interlayer and a transparent support, at least the optional image receiving layer or the prelayer comprising an image, characterized in that the interlayer contains a polyurethane and a cross-linking agent.

IPC 1-7

G03C 8/42; G03C 8/06; G11B 7/24

IPC 8 full level

G03C 8/06 (2006.01); G03C 8/42 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

G03C 8/06 (2013.01); G03C 8/423 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] DE 19631283 A1 19980205 - ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE]
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 114 (M - 1377) 9 March 1993 (1993-03-09)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 098, no. 008 30 June 1998 (1998-06-30) & DATABASE WPI Derwent World Patents Index; AN 98-211767
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 9111, Derwent World Patents Index; Class G06, AN 91-077592, XP002096602 & PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 153 (P - 1191) 17 April 1991 (1991-04-17)
  • [L] "NOVUS Technologies, Inc., Company and Product Summary", NOVUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Retrieved from Internet: URL: HTTP://WWW.NOVUSCARD.COM/COMPANY.HTML, 17.3.99, pages 1 - 5, XP002098449
  • [L] CANON EUROPA, SECURITY APPLICATIONS, Retrieved from Internet: URL:http://www.canon-europa.com/opticalcard/for_card_issuer/application/security/security.html, 17.3.99, pages 1 - 3, XP002098464

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 0977083 A1 20000202

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 99202008 A 19990623