Global patent index - EP 0977095 A3

EP 0977095 A3 2000-10-04 - Printer with two printing units

Title (en)

Printer with two printing units

Title (de)

Drucker mit zwei Druckwerken

Title (fr)

Imprimante comportant deux groupes d'impression

Publication

EP 0977095 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99113945 A

Priority

  • DE 19643654 A
  • EP 97945775 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9818052A1] Disclosed is a printer with two similar printing units (D1,D2) furnished with sheetlike material via a common input section (28). Printed material is ejected via a common output section (52).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 21/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/60 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/01 (2006.01); G03G 15/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/231 (2013.01); G03G 15/00 (2013.01); G03G 15/23 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00021 (2013.01); G03G 2215/0103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9818052 A1 19980430; CA 2269596 A1 19980430; CA 2269596 C 20060411; DE 19781180 D2 19990805; DE 59704090 D1 20010823; DE 59712929 D1 20080430; EP 0934554 A1 19990811; EP 0934554 B1 20010718; EP 0977095 A2 20000202; EP 0977095 A3 20001004; EP 0977095 B1 20080319; JP 2001502813 A 20010227; JP 4146901 B2 20080910; US 6212357 B1 20010403; US 6317581 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59712929

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121022

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121022

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111229

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20081222

2008-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59712929

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-04-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-03-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0934554

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G03G 15/00 20060101AFI20070703BHEP

2007-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G03G 15/23 20060101ALN20070703BHEP

2006-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060124

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010403

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 934554

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB