Global Patent Index - EP 0977124 A2

EP 0977124 A2 2000-02-02 - Method and apparatus for detecting unauthorised read or write access to a memory region

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for detecting unauthorised read or write access to a memory region

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zum Erkennen von unberechtigten Schreib- oder Lese-Zugriffen auf einen Speicherbereich

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de détection d'accès d'écriture ou de lecture non autorisé d'une zone mémoire

Publication

EP 0977124 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113047 A

Priority

DE 19834670 A

Abstract (en)

The unauthorised memory access detection method compares the actual memory address (adr) to which access is required for a write or read operation with stored programme memory addresses, to allow access to the required memory location when the actual memory address is identified, with temporary storage of a corresponding data memory location address upon data write-in. When the actual memory address is not identified it can be compared with previously stored data memory location addresses, with access to the memory only permitted if the actual memory address is identified.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Schreib- oder Lese-Zugriff auf einen Speicher (RAM) wird die aktuelle Zugriff-Speicheradresse (adr) mit gespeicherten Programm-Speicherbereichs-Adressen verglichen. Bei einem Auffinden wird der Lese-Zugriff auf den jeweiligen Programm-Speicherbereich (cb1...n) durchgeführt und zusätzlich zumindest eine zugeordnete Daten-Speicherbereichs-Adresse zwischengespeichert. Bei einem Nichtauffinden wird die Zugriff-Speicheradresse (adr) mit zuvor zwischengespeicherten Daten-Speicherbereichsadressen verglichen, wobei bei einem Auffinden der Schreib- oder Lese-Zugriff und bei einem Nichtauffinden kein Speicher-Zugriff erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 12/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/1441 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977124 A2 20000202; EP 0977124 A3 20030402; DE 19834670 A1 20000203; DE 19834670 C2 20011213

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031003

2004-02-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI