Global Patent Index - EP 0977159 A1

EP 0977159 A1 2000-02-02 - Electronic terminal apparatus

Title (en)

Electronic terminal apparatus

Title (de)

Elektronisches Endgerät

Title (fr)

Terminal électronique

Publication

EP 0977159 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98305968 A

Priority

EP 98305968 A

Abstract (en)

An electronic terminal (1) such as an information kiosk or cash dispenser is mounted behind a window (2) in a shop and usable through the glass (2) by means of a non-contact card (4), thus obviating the need to cut a hole in the glass to accomodate a card-reader (5) or other input device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/10; G06K 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07F 19/201 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977159 A1 20000202; EP 0977159 B1 20030507; DE 69814376 D1 20030612; DE 69814376 T2 20031204

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090727

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090727

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080714

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080704

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69814376 P 20030612

2003-05-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HITACHI COMPUTER PRODUCTS (EUROPE) S.A.S.

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020221

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI