Global Patent Index - EP 0977161 A1

EP 0977161 A1 2000-02-02 - Data processing and method

Title (en)

Data processing and method

Title (de)

Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtung und -verfahren

Title (fr)

Appareil et méthode de traitement de données

Publication

EP 0977161 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99305343 A

Priority

GB 9816504 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides for a data processing terminal (10), such as and ATM, including data processing means (20) and memory means for storage of software for appropriate functioning of the terminal, and including a magnetic card reader (26) arranged to receive a card carrying the said software and for reading the said software therefrom and into the said memory means. The magnetic card reader (26) is also arranged to receive a magnetic card allowing access to the terminal (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/10; G07F 9/02; G07F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G06Q 40/00 (2006.01); G07F 7/12 (2006.01); G07F 9/02 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/08 (2013.01); G07F 7/12 (2013.01); G07F 9/02 (2013.01); G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07F 19/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977161 A1 20000202; BR 9902902 A 20000328; CN 1245946 A 20000301; GB 9816504 D0 19980923; JP 2000090184 A 20000331; ZA 9904583 B 20010115

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020102

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI