Global Patent Index - EP 0977163 A2

EP 0977163 A2 2000-02-02 - Communications network

Title (en)

Communications network

Title (de)

Kommunikationsnetzwerk

Title (fr)

Réseau de communications

Publication

EP 0977163 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305625 A

Priority

  • GB 9816178 A
  • US 22904699 A

Abstract (en)

A communications network (10) comprises a plurality of network sites (12), to each of which a service terminal (16,18), a maintenance terminal (20), or a server (22) may be connected. Each service terminal (16,18), which may be an ATM or a point-of-sale terminal, has at least one service element (44), such as a card transport or currency bin, that is to be maintained in operation. Intelligent agent programs (50) move between terminals (16,18,20) collecting information from or imparting information to each terminal (16,18,20) visited. The information that is collected or imparted is used for facilitating efficient maintenance of the service terminals (16,18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/10; G07F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G06Q 40/00 (2006.01); G07F 5/18 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/002 (2013.01); G07F 5/18 (2013.01); G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07F 19/207 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977163 A2 20000202; EP 0977163 A3 20040428; BR 9902989 A 20000822; JP 2000067146 A 20000303

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060818

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041123

2004-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI