Global Patent Index - EP 0977164 A1

EP 0977164 A1 2000-02-02 - A device for separation of cups from stack of cups, e.g. in a vending machine, designed to serve beverages

Title (en)

A device for separation of cups from stack of cups, e.g. in a vending machine, designed to serve beverages

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Trennung von Bechern eines Becherstapels, z.B. in einem Verkaufsautomaten, entworfen zum Servieren von Getränken

Title (fr)

Un appareil pour séparer des gobelets d'une pile de gobelets, p.e. dans une machine de vente, dessiné à servir des boissons

Publication

EP 0977164 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99114325 A

Priority

SE 9802619 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a device (1) provided to separate cups (5) from a stack of cups. The device comprises a shell (3), which is stationarily mounted in the vending machine and which is provided to receive a stack of cups, a separator (4) for individual cups as well as a driving device (6) and a feed device (25) for separated cups, the shell (3) being telescopicly and concentrically respectively mounted in a sleeve-like holder (2), which is provided to be driven by said driving device (6) and be displaced during the separation phase in relation to the shell (3), with activation of said feed device (25). According to the invention, said feed device (25) is provided to be actuated by spring power during said relative movements between said stationary shell (3) and said moveable holder (2) and separator (4) to pivot into and out of, respectively, a recess (17) in said holder (2) and at the same time penetrate with a projection (45) into the region between flanges of the two lowermost cups, whereby bearing surfaces (43) on the feed devices being designed to be tilted downwards and release the flange of the lowermost cup. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 13/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977164 A1 20000202; EP 0977164 B1 20060607; DE 69931702 D1 20060720; DE 69931702 T2 20061228; SE 519338 C2 20030218; SE 9802619 D0 19980727; SE 9802619 L 20000128

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69931702

- Representative's name: ANDRAE WESTENDORP PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2006-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69931702 P 20060720

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2006-06-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-04-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NESTEC S.A.

2004-10-27 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040824

2004-09-22 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040314

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI