Global Patent Index - EP 0977211 A3

EP 0977211 A3 2000-05-31 - Electrical component with a restriction in a PTC polymer element

Title (en)

Electrical component with a restriction in a PTC polymer element

Title (de)

Elektrisches Bauteil mit einer Einschnürung in einem PTC-Polymerelement

Title (fr)

Composant électrique avec rétrécissement dans un élément PTC en polymère

Publication

EP 0977211 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810624 A

Priority

DE 19833609 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0977211A2] An electrical component consists of a positive temperature coefficient (PTC) polymer element (1) with neck sections (2) at right angles to the main current direction (3). The opening angle of the neck section in the main current direction longitudinal plane is at least 100 degrees.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833609 A1 20000127; EP 0977211 A2 20000202; EP 0977211 A3 20000531; US 6259349 B1 20010710

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060330

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FI FR GB NL

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB NL

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI