Global patent index - EP 0977220 A1

EP 0977220 A1 2000-02-02 - Printed circuit board

Title (en)

Printed circuit board

Title (de)

Leiterplatte

Title (fr)

Plaquette à circuit imprimé

Publication

EP 0977220 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99108119 A

Priority

DE 19834375 A

Abstract (en)

The circuit board has a surface with at least two contact areas and a spring-elastic contact body (4) for actuation by a switching pin or cam, whereby the contact body produces a contact reset voltage and short circuits the contact areas with a contact arm. The contact body is a hairpin spring (7) that protrudes through a circuit board opening (8) so that its two arms (9,10) are approximately parallel to the circuit board surfaces. The arm (9) on the contact area side of the circuit board is longer than the other arm (10) and has contact bulges (12,13) at the end and in the middle. The shorter arm ends between the bulges and has a supporting bulge (14) and hook section (15) on its end. The hook section locks into a hole in the circuit board.

Abstract (de)

Eine bekannte Leiterplatte läßt keinen Transport von Baugruppenteilen zu, da die Einzelteile nur lose zusammengesteckt sind, d. h. verlierbar sind. Hiergegen ist vorgesehen, daß der Kontaktkörper (4) als Haarnadelfeder (7) geformt ist und durch eine Leiterplattenöffnung (8) so hindurchragt, daß seine zwei Schenkel (9, 10) in etwa parallel zu den Leiterplattenoberflächen (11) ausgerichtet sind, daß der eine Schenkel (9) auf der Kontaktflächenseite der Leiterplatte (1) länger ist als der andere Schenkel (10) und Kontaktauswölbungen (12, 13) am Schenkelende und an der Schenkelmitte aufweist, daß der kürzere Schenkel (10) zwischen den beiden Kontaktauswölbungen (12, 13) endet und am Schenkelende eine Auflageauswölbung (14) und einen Hakenansatz (15) aufweist, wobei der Hakenansatz (15) in eine weitere Leiterplattenöffnung (16) hineinragt und in dieser arretiert ist. Die neue Leiterplatte ist leicht zu fertigen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/58 (2006.01); H01H 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/5805 (2013.01); H01H 1/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834375 C1 19991209; EP 0977220 A1 20000202; EP 0977220 B1 20030212; ES 2189307 T3 20030701

INPADOC legal status

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060425

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060424

2006-04-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-04-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060424

2005-04-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050411

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2189307

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904261

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000120

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI