Global Patent Index - EP 0977222 A2

EP 0977222 A2 2000-02-02 - Electrical connection device

Title (en)

Electrical connection device

Title (de)

Stromübertragungseinheit und Stromübertrager

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion électrique

Publication

EP 0977222 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114945 A

Priority

DE 19834432 A

Abstract (en)

The unit includes a leaf spring (23) which exerts a force parallel to, and acting upon, a contact pin (K). This force is outward when the pin is between the contacting state and an intermediate position. The force is inward when the pin is between the intermediate position and a neutral state.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Stromübertragungseinheit mit mindestens einem beweglichen Kontaktstift K, der zumindest eine elektrisch leitende Kontaktstelle aufweist, beschrieben. Der Kontaktstift ist zwischen einem Ruhezustand, in welchem er in der Stromübertragungseinheit 20 versenkt ist, und einem Kontaktzustand, in welchem er aus dieser herausragt, bewegbar. In der Stromübertragungseinheit 20 ist eine Federeinrichtung 23 vorgesehen, die mit dem Kontaktstift K in Wirkverbindung steht und auf diesen eine Kraft ausübt, welche eine Komponente parallel zur Bewegungsrichtung des Kontaktstiftes K aufweist. Die Richtung der durch die Federeinrichtung 23 auf den Kontaktstift K ausgeübten Kraft ist in der Weise veränderlich, daß die Komponente dieser Kraft parallel zur Bewegungsrichtung des Kontaktstiftes K nach außen weist, wenn sich der Kontaktstift K zwischen dem Kontaktzustand und einem Zwischenzustand befindet und daß die Komponente dieser Kraft parallel zu Bewegungsrichtung des Kontaktstiftes K nach innen weist, wenn sich der Kontaktstift K zwischen dem Ruhezustand und dem Zwischenzustand befindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/16; H01H 5/18; H01R 13/629

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/16 (2006.01); H01H 5/18 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2013.01); H01H 3/161 (2013.01); H01H 5/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977222 A2 20000202; EP 0977222 A3 20001206; DE 19834432 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-10-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EFF-EFF FRITZ FUSS GMBH & CO. KG AA

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001205

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI