Global Patent Index - EP 0977222 A3

EP 0977222 A3 2000-12-06 - Electrical connection device

Title (en)

Electrical connection device

Title (de)

Stromübertragungseinheit und Stromübertrager

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion électrique

Publication

EP 0977222 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99114945 A

Priority

DE 19834432 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0977222A2] The unit includes a leaf spring (23) which exerts a force parallel to, and acting upon, a contact pin (K). This force is outward when the pin is between the contacting state and an intermediate position. The force is inward when the pin is between the intermediate position and a neutral state.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/16; H01H 5/18; H01R 13/629

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/16 (2006.01); H01H 5/18 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2013.01); H01H 3/161 (2013.01); H01H 5/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977222 A2 20000202; EP 0977222 A3 20001206; DE 19834432 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-10-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EFF-EFF FRITZ FUSS GMBH & CO. KG AA

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001205

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI