Global Patent Index - EP 0977230 A2

EP 0977230 A2 2000-02-02 - Circuit arrangement for controlling of electromagnetic actuation means and method for operating such circuit arrangement

Title (en)

Circuit arrangement for controlling of electromagnetic actuation means and method for operating such circuit arrangement

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zur Ansteuerung eines elektromagnetischen Betätigungsorgans und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer derartigen Schaltungsanordnung

Title (fr)

Circuit pour contrôler un actionneur électromagnetique et procédé pour le fonctionnement d'un tel circuit

Publication

EP 0977230 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111235 A

Priority

DE 19834204 A

Abstract (en)

Actuating mechanisms have activation coils (L2,L2',L3,L3') with a coil core, also activation switches (T2,T2',T3,T3') to connect and disconnect the activation coils to and from an energy source (4) and a ferromagnetic adjuster with movable bearings to go from static to active driven by a magnetic field created by an activation coil with the activation switch off.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Schaltungsanordnung zur Ansteuerung eines elektromagnetischen Betätigungsorgans mit einer Aktivierungsspule mit Spulenkern, einem Aktivierungsschalter zum Verbinden und Trennen der Aktivierungsspule mit bzw. von einer Energiequelle und einem beweglich gelagerten, ferromagnetischen Stellelement, das bei geschlossenem Aktivierungaschalter durch das von der Aktivierungsspule erzeugte Magnetfeld von einer Ruheposition in eine Aktivierungsposition bewegbar ist, beschrieben. Erfindungsgemäß ist zur Speicherung magnetischer Hilfsenergie ein Energiespeicherelement vorgesehen, das für eine Übertragung der in dem Energiespeicherelement gespeicherten Hilfsenergie auf die Aktivierungsspule mit dieser verbunden ist. Weiterhin ist eine Steuereinheit vorgesehen, durch die der Zeitpunkt der Energieübertragung steuerbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/1816 (2013.01); F02D 41/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977230 A2 20000202; EP 0977230 A3 20010816; DE 19834204 A1 20000203; JP 2000100621 A 20000407; JP 3094020 B2 20001003

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020219

2002-06-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI