Global patent index - EP 0977232 A3

EP 0977232 A3 2001-03-21 - Conductor subhousing for a circuit breaker

Title (en)

Conductor subhousing for a circuit breaker

Title (de)

Teilgehäuse für Leiter in Schutzschaltern

Title (fr)

Compartiment séparé pour conducteur pour disjoncteurs

Publication

EP 0977232 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99114345 A

Priority

US 12327598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0977232A2] This concerns a molded case circuit breaker 10 including slot motor 54, arc chute A80, operating mechanism, stationary main contact 64 and line terminal arrangement 171. The stationary main terminal 64, line terminal 71 arrangement is assembled in a separate member and inserted into the bottom of the circuit interrupter in one piece with a line terminal portion being fed through a narrow opening 112 in an internal vertical wall 115 of the circuit interrupter. The fixed contact 64 and its u-shaped contact arm 68 and conductor member 128 is snugly dispose within the assembled molded case circuit interrupter with reduced openings between the arc chamber thereof and other portions of the circuit interrupter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/02; H01H 11/06; H01H 71/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/02 (2006.01); H01H 71/08 (2006.01); H01H 11/06 (2006.01); H01H 77/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/0207 (2013.01); H01H 71/08 (2013.01); H01H 11/06 (2013.01); H01H 71/0214 (2013.01); H01H 71/0228 (2013.01); H01H 77/108 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977232 A2 20000202; EP 0977232 A3 20010321; CA 2279056 A1 20000128; ID 23709 A 20000511

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010922

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01H 71/02 A, 7H 01H 11/06 B, 7H 01H 71/08 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI