Global Patent Index - EP 0977233 A1

EP 0977233 A1 2000-02-02 - Circuit breaker with high electrodynamic strength and breaking capacity

Title (en)

Circuit breaker with high electrodynamic strength and breaking capacity

Title (de)

Leistungsschalter mit hoher elektrodynamischer Festigkeit und Ausschaltleistung

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur à tenue électrodynamique et pouvoir de coupure élevés

Publication

EP 0977233 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410088 A

Priority

FR 9809938 A

Abstract (en)

An electromagnetic compensating device and limiting device hold the contact position of fingers (41) to other contact, when the current through a pair of contact (28,30) is less than a limiting threshold, otherwise drive the fingers to retracted position. An actuator drives the ultrafast movement of an opening lock (60) to unlock position, when the resultant force applied to kinematic connecting devices exceeded the preset limiting threshold, otherwise switches the opening lock. An operating mechanism (10) moves to lock and unlock position to release either the loaded or unloaded position of an opening spring (52).

Abstract (fr)

Le ou les pôles du disjoncteur comportent un organe de contact mobile 28 avec une cage de support 26 mobile par rapport au châssis 12 entre une position d'ouverture et une position de fermeture et un ou plusieurs doigts de contact 41 mobiles par rapport à la cage de support 26 entre une position de contact et une position de retrait. Des moyens de compensation électromagnétique 88 sont aptes à appliquer sur le ou les doigts de contact des forces électromagnétiques tendant à maintenir le ou les doigts en contact avec l'organe de contact fixe. Des moyens de limitation électromagnétique 90 sont aptes à appliquer sur le ou les doigts de contact 41 des forces électromagnétiques tendant à entraîner le ou les doigts vers leur position de retrait. Les moyens de compensation électromagnétique 88 et les moyens de limitation électromagnétique 90 sont tels que lorsque l'intensité du courant traversant l'organe de contact mobile 28 est en deçà d'un seuil dit de limitation, le ou les doigts sont maintenus en contact avec l'organe de contact fixe, et qu'au delà dudit seuil, le ou les doigts sont entraînés vers leur position de retrait. La résultante des forces appliquées par la cage 26 sur l'organe de liaison cinématique 24 lorsque l'intensité du courant traversant l'organe de contact mobile 28 atteint le seuil de limitation est en deçà du seuil d'ouverture ultra-rapide. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 77/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 73/02 (2006.01); H01H 77/10 (2006.01); H01H 83/02 (2006.01); H01H 9/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 77/101 (2013.01); H01H 9/446 (2013.01); H01H 2071/507 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977233 A1 20000202; EP 0977233 B1 20060503; CN 1168114 C 20040922; CN 1253371 A 20000517; DE 69931109 D1 20060608; DE 69931109 T2 20061012; ES 2262299 T3 20061116; FR 2781921 A1 20000204; FR 2781921 B1 20000915; JP 2000106075 A 20000411; JP 4278787 B2 20090617; US 6018284 A 20000125

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160701

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2262299 T3

2006-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060606

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69931109 P 20060608

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-06-14 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-06-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI