Global Patent Index - EP 0977234 A2

EP 0977234 A2 2000-02-02 - Trip device for a ground fault circuit breaker and circuit for controlling the same

Title (en)

Trip device for a ground fault circuit breaker and circuit for controlling the same

Title (de)

Auslöseeinrichtung für einen Fehlerstromschutzschalter und Schaltungsanordnung zur Ansteuerung derselben

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déclenchement pour un disjoncteur à courant de défaut et circuit de commande approprié

Publication

EP 0977234 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113505 A

Priority

DE 19833829 A

Abstract (en)

Circuit breaker has trip with magnetic drive arrangement. Area between yoke legs (12,14) has magnetic actuator (25) which has second permanent magnet (26) and coil (27). If faulty current occurs, extra coil impacts armature of trip. Bistable actuator is used as magnetic drive, providing sufficient energy to overcome adhesion force armature and pole surface.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Auslöseeinrichtung für einen Fehlerstromschutzschalter mit einem Auslöser, der ein Joch, einen einen ersten magnetischen Fluß im Joch erzeugenden Permanentmagneten, einem Anker und eine Spule aufweist, wobei die Spule eine dem ersten magnetischen Fluß entgegengesetzt gerichteten zweiten magnetischen Fluß bei Auftreten eines Fehlerstromes im Joch erzeugt, so daß ein an das Joch vom ersten magnetischen Fluß angezogener Klappanker von der Kraft einer ersten Feder vom Joch abgezogen wird und dadurch ein Schaltschloß entriegelt, wodurch der Fehlerstromschutzschalter geöffnet wird. Diese Auslöseeinrichtung enthält eine Magnetantriebsanordnung mit einem weiteren Permanentmagneten, einer weiteren Spule und einem Tauchanker, der beim Auftreten eines Fehlerstromes von der weiteren Spule mittels einer Federkraft aus einer ersten Stellung, in der er nicht, in eine zweite Stellung, in der er den Klappanker des Auslösers aufschlägt, angetriebenen ist. Diese Magnetantriebsanordnung, die als Aktor bezeichnet wird, kann in den Auslöser integriert werden; in einer zweckmäßigen Ausgestaltung wird diese Magnetantriebsanordnung dem Auslöser zugeordnet, d. h. räumlich von dem Auslöser getrennt mit dem Klappanker des Auslösers gekoppelt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/144 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977234 A2 20000202; EP 0977234 A3 20001115; DE 19833829 A1 20000203

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030203

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR

2001-08-01 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990728

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990728

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 83/14 A, 7H 01H 71/32 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990728